+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Chun Oakland, Kidani Co-Chairs; Ruderman, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Fale Members.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 601) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3346) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-14 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3010) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/HMS deferred the measure until 03-17-14 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-14 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 300).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:00AM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 11:00AM.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-10-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor