+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-04-20 10:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.