+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say, Thielen.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-01-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.