+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 113).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor