+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from HHS/PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/PBS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:05AM in House conference room 329.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS/PBS, JUD, referral sheet 7
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor