+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Act 135, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 135, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:30PM in conference room 309.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:00PM in conference room 325.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nishimoto, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 163) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 163).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:45PM in conference room 325.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 325.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; English Co-Chair; K. Rhoads.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto, Holt Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 553) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1501) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Tupola.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor