+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 423.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-22-14 10:10AM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takai, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ito, Ward Members.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3311) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2949) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Green.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86).
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 576-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott, Wooley.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor