+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 891-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor