+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-03-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor