+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor