+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:25PM in Conference Room 309.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-16 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Ihara, Slom.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 565) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3473) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-17-16 1:30PM in conference room 414.
- Re-Referred to GVO, WAM.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 2:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 109).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.