+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 225.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 225.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Yamane, Lowen Co-Chairs; Pouha.
- Re-referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 51
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; L. Thielen, Slom.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 563) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3514) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3057) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA deferred the measure until 03-21-16 2:51PM in conference room 224.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA deferred the measure until 03-18-16 3:05PM in conference room 224.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 244).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor