+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor