+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 150).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 569) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor