+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-05-20 8:35AM in House conference room 312.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor