+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 132-16).
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 132-16) as amended in (CD 1).
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 1:00PM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Matsumoto replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; English, Slom.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 558) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3594) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2970) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 100).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 774-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:00AM in conference room 308.
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-08-16 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor