+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 26).
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Rhoads voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 363-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, San Buenaventura.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-12-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor