+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 748-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Evans, Har, Hashem, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Ing, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-01-18 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.