+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.