+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Belatti, Woodson.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor