+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 887) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:30AM in House conference room 308.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Wooley.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor