+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 309).
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hashimoto, Matayoshi, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-28-20 9:15AM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor