+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 279).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Wooley, Thielen.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-24-14 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.