+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153).
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matayoshi, Okimoto, Perruso, Todd voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates, B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-12-20 11:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor