+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 12).
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-23-14 at 2:00pm.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-17-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor