+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-25-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor