+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 26-16).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 26-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Baker, Riviere, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Oshiro, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday, April 26, 2016 at 2:30PM in Conference Room 229.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs; Green.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3501) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2956) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-18-16 10:00AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman, Slom.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:35PM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.