+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 109, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act 109, on 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 142-14).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 142-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Ige, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Yamashita, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 11:00AM in conference room 225.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-14 10:45AM in conference room 225.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 679).
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker, Ige Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Slom Members.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Kawakami, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Thielen Members.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3288) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3070) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-14 3:35PM in conference room 225.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 154).
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano voting no (2) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ito, Oshiro.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Awana, Belatti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano voting no (2) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Evans, Kawakami; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say, Fale; and Excused: none.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor