+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor