+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 056, 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
On June 29, 2018 in the House:
- Act 056, on 06/27/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147-18) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147-18).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Taniguchi, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Ruderman, L. Thielen.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Holt Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Ward.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 562) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3412) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to GVO, JDC.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-08-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor