+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 11:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 11:30AM.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 10:15AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.