+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 377-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Say, Fale; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano; and Excused: none.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-14 8:35AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-14.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-05-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor