+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:20 PM in Conference Room 325.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147-16) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147-16).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:15PM in conference room 325.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 2:20PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 679).
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Gabbard, Shimabukuro.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Matsumoto replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Belatti, San Buenaventura, Pouha.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-30-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 610-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-02-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor