+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 11, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 1
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.