+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 010, 04/26/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Act 010, on 04/26/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 608).
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-07-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198).
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 9:15AM; Via Videoconference.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 933), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor