+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 01-31-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor