+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Matsumoto.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 3
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor