+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2998) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, C. Lee, Oshiro.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 506-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Oshiro.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14 at 10:00am.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.