+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.