+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 285).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Yamane, McDermott.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-09-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-18.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 6
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor