+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 90-16).
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 90-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Baker, Tokuda, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Luke, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 688).
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator L. Thielen discharged as Conferee.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Tupola.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Baker, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Ihara, L. Thielen.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 544) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3496) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2953) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-18-16 10:00AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman, Slom.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-16 1:35PM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 84).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-10-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor