+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor