+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-02-18 8:45AM in House conference room 309.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to EDB, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 10
- Recommitted to EDB as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Mizuno excused.
- Recommends recommittal to EDB.
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2-18) as amended in HD 1.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-26-18 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, referral sheet 4
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor