+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-14 10:15AM in conference room 325.
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-14, 10:15a.m.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Saturday, 02-08-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor