+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 33).
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 722-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).
- Reported from EEP/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HLT on Tuesday, 02-11-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor