+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:35 PM in Conference Room 423.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 4:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 10:30AM in conference room 423.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 423.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; English, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Galuteria, K.Kahele.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Matsumoto replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s).
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Pouha.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Inouye, Nishihara . Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Kim, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3507) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET/TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Green, K.Kahele, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Slom.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom, Keith-Agaran ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI deferred the measure until 03-21-16 2:45PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-18-16 1:40PM in conference room 414.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/TSI, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 226).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor