+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor