+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 507-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Oshiro.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14 at 10:00am.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor