+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 073, 4/30/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 073, 4/30/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1173).
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 688).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 678).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Slom Members.
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 03-24-14.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 391).
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Hee, Ige, Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-21-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2924) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Ito, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Har, C. Lee.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Takai, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fale.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-27-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.