+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.